ND 3012 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section 25 of article XI of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to authorizing internet live poker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing internet live poker.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt yeas 0 nays 47
2021-03-29SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 54 nays 40
2021-02-22HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-18HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback