ND HCR3011 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying and researching the impact of substance abuse and neonatal withdrawal syndrome, including a focus on fetal alcohol spectrum disorders (FASDs), including treatment, services available, potential prevention, and whether existing policies for children and adults are appropriate.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying and researching the impact of substance abuse and neonatal withdrawal syndrome, including a focus on fetal alcohol spectrum disorders (FASDs), including treatment, services available, potential prevention, and whether existing policies for children and adults are appropriate.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Mitch Ostlie [R] | Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Cole Conley [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted as amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-25 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-01-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-21 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |