ND HCR3009 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the use of open textbooks in the North Dakota University System, including options to develop partnerships with other states to use open textbooks.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the use of open textbooks in the North Dakota University System, including options to develop partnerships with other states to use open textbooks.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Rep. Joe Heilman [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22 |
2013-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 11 0 2 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |