ND 3006 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution calling for a convention for the purpose of amending the United States Constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution calling for a convention for the purpose of amending the United States Constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/29
2017-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-23SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-17HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 69 nays 18
2017-02-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback