ND 3004 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging the Department of Transportation to use dynamic message signs solely for weather-related, road condition, emergency, work zone, and missing persons messages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging the Department of Transportation to use dynamic message signs solely for weather-related, road condition, emergency, work zone, and missing persons messages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt
2021-03-26SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-01SenateReceived from House
2021-01-29HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 61 nays 28
2021-01-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 1
2021-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback