ND 3004 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the potential benefit value of blockchain technology implementation and utilization in state government administration and affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to study the potential benefit value of blockchain technology implementation and utilization in state government administration and affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateReceived from House
2019-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-08HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback