ND 3003 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the impact of Marsy's Law on the statutorily provided rights of crime victims and those alleged to have committed crimes, and the criminal procedures relating to the rights of victims and criminal defendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the impact of Marsy's Law on the statutorily provided rights of crime victims and those alleged to have committed crimes, and the criminal procedures relating to the rights of victims and criminal defendants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/14
2017-03-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-14SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseReturned to House
2017-03-10SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-09SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-25HouseSecond reading, adopted
2017-01-18HouseReported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback