ND HCR3002 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution recognizing the memorandum of understanding and option to acquire land entered by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, by and through the State Penitentiary and the Missouri River Correctional Center and the Parks and Recreation Department.
Title
A concurrent resolution recognizing the memorandum of understanding and option to acquire land entered by the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, by and through the State Penitentiary and the Missouri River Correctional Center and the Parks and Recreation Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24 |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-19 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 87 nays 4 |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |