ND 3002 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the operation, management, conditions, standards, and supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and other potential means to improve the rehabilitative function of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and a possible transition of the supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities from the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to the Attorney General.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the operation, management, conditions, standards, and supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and other potential means to improve the rehabilitative function of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and a possible transition of the supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities from the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to the Attorney General.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/21
2017-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-17SenateSigned by President
2017-03-16HouseReturned to House
2017-03-15SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-14SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-24HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 88 nays 1
2017-01-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:40
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback