ND 3001 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to temporarily amend cargo carrying truck length and weight restrictions on state highways and interstates that are a part of the National Network to allow North Dakota and surrounding states to conduct a road train pilot program and to permanently amend the restrictions to allow road trains on the National Network highways and interstates if the pilot program is successful.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to temporarily amend cargo carrying truck length and weight restrictions on state highways and interstates that are a part of the National Network to allow North Dakota and surrounding states to conduct a road train pilot program and to permanently amend the restrictions to allow road trains on the National Network highways and interstates if the pilot program is successful.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14SenateReceived from House
2021-01-13HouseSecond reading, adopted
2021-01-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-01-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback