ND 3001 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution declaring March 3, 2017, as "National Speech and Debate Education Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution declaring March 3, 2017, as "National Speech and Debate Education Day".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/13
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-09HouseReturned to House
2017-03-08SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-25HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 87 nays 6
2017-01-20HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 11:15
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback