ND 2368 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapters 26.1-40.1 and 39-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transportation network company services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network company services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-17SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 39
2015-04-17SenateConcurred
2015-04-02SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2015-04-01HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 13
2015-03-31HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 5 2
2015-03-19HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2015-02-25HouseReceived from Senate
2015-02-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2015-02-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-02-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2015-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-26SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback