ND SB2365 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the laws relating to the humane treatment of animals.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the laws relating to the humane treatment of animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Phillip Mueller [D] |
Rep. John Wall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56 | |
2011-03-25 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-03-18 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-02-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |