ND SB2359 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to provide for a legislative management study of the scope of practice and regulation of electricians.
Title
A BILL to provide for a legislative management study of the scope of practice and regulation of electricians.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] |
Rep. James Schmidt [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2019-03-15 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 0 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |