ND SB2357 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 12.1-17-07.2 and a new section to chapter 32-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the distribution of graphic or intimate images of someone without consent; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The distribution of graphic or intimate images of someone without consent; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Rep. Ben Hanson [D] |
Rep. William Kretschmar [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |