ND SB2356 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study regarding absentee voting and voting by mail.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study regarding absentee voting and voting by mail.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Bob Martinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 44 |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |