ND 2345 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 11-33-02.1, 11-33-22, 23-25-11, 23.1-06-15, 58-03-11.1, and 58-03-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to animal feeding operations and zoning regulations; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide an effective date; to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal feeding operations and zoning regulations; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide an effective date; to provide a contingent effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Governor 05/01
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25SenateSigned by President
2019-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 14
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 11
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-15HouseConference committee appointed D. Johnson Dobervich Trottier
2019-04-11SenateConference committee appointed Luick O. Larsen Hogan
2019-04-11SenateRefused to concur
2019-04-08SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 19
2019-04-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-13HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 7
2019-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2345.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-02014a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1146-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-27.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-62.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-73.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback