ND 2344 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 47-31-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to injection or migration of substances into pore space; and to amend and reenact sections 38-08-25, 38-11.1-01, and 38-11.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pore space and oil and gas production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pore space and oil and gas production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19SenateSigned by Governor 04/18
2019-04-18SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-18SenateSigned by President
2019-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 24
2019-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 12
2019-04-16SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-15SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-04HouseConference committee appointed Keiser Roers Jones Mitskog
2019-04-02SenateConference committee appointed Unruh Schaible Piepkorn
2019-04-02SenateRefused to concur
2019-03-29SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-28HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 65 nays 26
2019-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 12:00
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 04:00
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 07:30
2019-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-13HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-02-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-11SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2344.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-01002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-02007a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-02011a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1141-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-27.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-55.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback