ND SB2342 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 4.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to healthy soil grant and healthy soil assessment and education programs; and to amend and reenact sections 4.1-20-01, 4.1-20-02, subsection 5 of section 4.1-20-18, sections 4.1-20-19, 4.1-20-23, 4.1-20-24, 4.1-20-25, 4.1-20-26, 4.1-20-28, subsection 1 of section 4.1-20-32, and section 4.1-20-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to soil conservation, soil conservation district supervisor compensation, training, powers and duties, elections, and land use regulations; and to provide for a continuing appropriation.
Title
Soil conservation, soil conservation district supervisor compensation, training, powers and duties, elections, and land use regulations; and to provide for a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] | Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |