ND 2341 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring mud flaps on certain vehicles; to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to moving violations; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Moving violations; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
2017-03-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-06HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2017-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6
2017-02-17SenateAmendment adopted
2017-02-17SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2017-02-16SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback