ND SB2341 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring mud flaps on certain vehicles; to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to moving violations; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Moving violations; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72 |
2017-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |