ND 2340 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 11-18-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees charged by a county recorder for filing mortgage disclosures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees charged by a county recorder for filing mortgage disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2017-04-05SenateConcurred
2017-04-03SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 5
2017-04-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 2
2017-03-22HouseRereferred to Political Subdivisions
2017-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 1
2017-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-14SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2340.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-03003a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-05001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-07000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0849-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-62.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback