ND 2338 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 57-39.2-02.3 and 57-40.2-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to collection of sales and use tax by marketplace facilitators; to amend and reenact subsection 22 of section 57-39.2-01, and subsections 6 and 7 of section 57-40.2-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of retailer and retail sale; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of retailer and retail sale; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by President
2019-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 18
2019-03-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
2019-01-30SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback