ND SB2335 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 43-47-01, 43-47-04, 43-47-05, and 43-47-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure of professional counselors designated supervised; and to provide for application.
Title
Licensure of professional counselors designated supervised; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] |
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |