ND 2333 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to in-application payments for software applications and purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-application payments for software applications and purchases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 36
2021-02-16SenateAmendment adopted
2021-02-16SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-02-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-11SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback