ND 2332 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of flaring rates and the flaring of gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of flaring rates and the flaring of gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
2019-02-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-12SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
2019-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback