ND SB2332 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for special education support grants.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for special education support grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Rep. Robert Frantsvog [R] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 33 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |