ND SB2332 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for hunting on big game preserves; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for hunting on big game preserves; to provide a penalty; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
Sen. David O'Connell [D] | Rep. Dwight Wrangham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 59 | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 2 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |