ND 2330 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 35-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the rights of owners of self-service storage facilities; and to amend and reenact sections 35-33-01, 35-33-02, 35-33-03, 35-33-04, 35-33-05, 35-33-07, 35-33-09, and 35-33-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to self-service storage facility liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-service storage facility liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateSigned by Governor 03/23
2021-03-19SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-19SenateSigned by President
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-17SenateReturned to Senate
2021-03-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2
2021-03-11HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 11:15
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback