ND SB2330 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a childhood trauma and violence pilot program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a childhood trauma and violence pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 40 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |