ND SB2329 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of the international business and trade office from the department of commerce to the agriculture commissioner; and to repeal section 54-60-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the international business and trade office.
Title
The international business and trade office.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |