ND 2329 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 43-30-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to private investigative services by security officers; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private investigative services by security officers; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/07
2017-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-04SenateConcurred
2017-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-03-30HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1
2017-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback