ND 2329 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-23-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03SenateSigned by Governor 04/03
2013-04-02SenateSent to Governor
2013-04-01SenateSigned by President
2013-04-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-28SenateReturned to Senate
2013-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12
2013-03-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
2013-03-20HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-21HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2013-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2013-02-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6
2013-02-14SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-13SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2013-02-12SenateCommittee Hearing 10:50
2013-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback