ND 2328 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-31-03, subsection 9 of section 12.1-31-03, subsection 3 of section 12.1-31-03.2, and sections 57-36-01, 57-36-02, 57-36-04, and 57-36-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sale of tobacco to minors and licensure of persons in the business of selling tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of tobacco to minors and licensure of persons in the business of selling tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 22 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
2017-03-28HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 4 0
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 10:40
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 18
2017-02-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback