ND SB2328 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-31-03, subsection 9 of section 12.1-31-03, subsection 3 of section 12.1-31-03.2, and sections 57-36-01, 57-36-02, 57-36-04, and 57-36-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sale of tobacco to minors and licensure of persons in the business of selling tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Sale of tobacco to minors and licensure of persons in the business of selling tobacco products; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 22 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70 |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 4 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 18 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |