ND 2327 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 43-15.3-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to license exception for outsourcing facility regarding certain sales; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License exception for outsourcing facility regarding certain sales; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateSigned by Governor 03/19
2019-03-15SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-15SenateSigned by President
2019-03-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-13SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-01-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback