ND 2324 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 24-03-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to installation of culverts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Installation of culverts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 72
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 22
2021-02-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2021-02-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback