ND 2323 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 11-09.1, a new section to chapter 11-33, a new section to chapter 40-05, and a new section to chapter 40-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the zoning authority of counties and cities with respect to abortion facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The zoning authority of counties and cities with respect to abortion facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 33
2021-02-15SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback