ND SB2323 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to variance reports for certain construction projects at institutions of higher education.
Title
Variance reports for certain construction projects at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Randel Christmann [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor 04/26 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-08 | Concurred | |
2011-04-05 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |