ND 2322 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 32-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state employee claims for wrongful criminal investigation or prosecution; to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 44-08-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disclosure of a pending investigation; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The disclosure of a pending investigation; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
2021-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback