ND 2322 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 10-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/07
2017-04-05SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-04SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-03SenateConcurred
2017-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2
2017-03-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 2
2017-03-20HouseCommittee Hearing 09:40
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback