ND 2317 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer charges for fees for services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance producer charges for fees for services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 32
2017-02-15SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
2017-02-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback