ND 2315 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 12.1-22-03, 20.1-01-17, 20.1-01-18, and 20.1-03-42 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal trespass and hunting on private land; to repeal section 20.1-01-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prima facie evidence of hunting; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prima facie evidence of hunting; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 48
2019-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-25HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 29 nays 17
2019-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-25SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-16HouseConference committee appointed Schreiber-Beck Heinert Tveit
2019-04-15SenateConference committee appointed Luick Erbele O. Larsen
2019-04-15SenateRefused to concur
2019-04-11SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-11HouseEmergency clause failed
2019-04-11HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 55 nays 38
2019-04-11HouseDivision B lost
2019-04-11HouseDivision A passed
2019-04-11HouseDivision of bill
2019-04-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-04-02HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-04-01HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-04-01HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-03-28HouseCommittee Hearing 07:30
2019-03-27HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 18
2019-02-19SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2315.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-01006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-02013a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0896-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-32.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-75.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback