ND SB2315 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of a lay and traditional midwife registry; to amend and reenact sections 43-12.1-02, 43-12.1-09, and 43-12.1-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the registry of lay and traditional midwives; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The registry of lay and traditional midwives; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 0 | |
2011-02-01 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |