ND 2311 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee Hearing 03:00
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 3:00 am in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a review of North Dakota health education content standards and curriculum; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a review of North Dakota health education content standards and curriculum; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-02-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-11SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback