ND 2311 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a Bank of North Dakota letter of credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a Bank of North Dakota letter of credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2017-04-10SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-06HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-05SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-04SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
2017-04-03HouseConference committee appointed D. Ruby Louser Boschee
2017-03-30SenateConference committee appointed Roers Campbell Marcellais
2017-03-30SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback