ND 2310 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 43-09-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to inspections of electrical wiring installations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inspections of electrical wiring installations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2017-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-13SenateSigned by President
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-13SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-03-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 3
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback