ND SB2309 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 53-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a charitable gaming operating fund; to amend and reenact sections 53-06.1-08.2 and 53-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic pull tab device requirements and limitations and charitable gaming tax; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Electronic pull tab device requirements and limitations and charitable gaming tax; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |