ND 2308 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact two new subsections to section 15.1-09-33 and a new section to chapter 15.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school board authority regarding the displaying of the ten commandments and the recitation of the pledge of allegiance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board authority regarding the displaying of the ten commandments and the recitation of the pledge of allegiance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateSigned by Governor 04/16
2021-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by President
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8
2021-04-09SenateConcurred
2021-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 16
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseRequest return from committee
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13
2021-02-02SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2021-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback