ND SB2307 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of voter lists; and to amend and reenact sections 16.1-01-03, 16.1-02-12, and 16.1-16-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hours of polling places, information in the central voter file, and election recounts.
Title
Hours of polling places, information in the central voter file, and election recounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] |
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |